EP1074698 - A gas turbine comprising coated coolant supply tubes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/06] | A lubricating coating for tubes in gas turbines | ||
[2011/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.02.2013 [2013/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/06] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mashey, Thomas Charles RR2, Box 1244 Athens, New York 12015 / US | [2001/06] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth, et al GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2001/06] | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99307783.3 | 01.10.1999 | [2001/06] | Priority number, date | US19990368458 | 03.08.1999 Original published format: US 368458 | [2001/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1074698 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1074698 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | [2001/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1074698 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F01D9/06, F16L25/00 | [2001/06] | CPC: |
B22F5/04 (KR);
B32B15/00 (KR);
C23C28/321 (EP);
C23C28/34 (EP);
F01D25/18 (EP);
F01D5/084 (EP);
F01D9/06 (EP);
F02C7/00 (KR);
F16J15/00 (KR);
F16L58/08 (EP);
F16L58/14 (EP);
F05C2201/0463 (EP);
F05D2230/90 (EP);
F05D2300/21 (EP);
F05D2300/509 (EP);
F05D2300/611 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2002/31] |
Former [2001/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gasturbine mit beschichteten Leitungen eines Kühlmediums | [2011/31] | English: | A gas turbine comprising coated coolant supply tubes | [2011/31] | French: | Turbine à gaz comprenant des tubes d'alimentation de fluide de refroidissement revêtus | [2011/31] |
Former [2001/06] | Schutz- und Schmierschicht für Rohre in Gasturbinen | ||
Former [2001/06] | A lubricating coating for tubes in gas turbines | ||
Former [2001/06] | Revêtement lubrifiant pour des tubes dans des turbines à gaz | Examination procedure | 14.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 16.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.08.2005 | Opposition(s) | 30.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5682596 (TAYLOR KEVIN P [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * figure 1 * * tables 1,2 *; | [Y]US4980241 (HOFFMUELLER WILHELM [DE], et al) [Y] 1-14 * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 6 * * column 6, line 20 - line 30 * * figure 5 *; | [A]WO9525185 (SHERRITT INC [CA]) [A] 1,2,4-10,12,13 * page 2, line 7 - line 20 * * page 4, line 24 - line 29 * * page 5, line 23 - page 6, line 13 * * tables 5,6 *; | [A]US3839024 (DEMO J, et al) [A] 3-9 * column 5, line 22 - line 23 * * claim 4 * * table 1 *; | [A] - HIRVONEN J-P ET AL, "PRESENT PROGRESS IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF LOW FRICTION COATINGS", SURFACE AND COATINGS TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1996), vol. 80, no. 1/2, ISSN 0257-8972, pages 139 - 150, XP000994576 [A] 1-14 * page 139 - page 150 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0257-8972(95)02701-7 |