EP0996092 - Efficient hashing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Patel, Sarvar 34 Miller Lane Montville, New Jersey 07045 / US | 02 /
Ramzan, Zulfikar Amin 282 Newbury Street, No. 20 Boston, Massachusetts 02115 / US | [2000/17] | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd Patent Business c/o Nokia 125 Finsbury Pavement London EC2A 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2006/09] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [2000/17] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 99308032.4 | 12.10.1999 | [2000/17] | Priority number, date | US19980175178 | 20.10.1998 Original published format: US 175178 | [2000/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0996092 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0996092 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | [2004/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0996092 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06T9/00 | [2000/17] | CPC: |
H03M7/30 (EP,US);
G06F7/60 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/17] | Title | German: | Effiziente Verfahren zum Hashkodieren | [2000/17] | English: | Efficient hashing method | [2000/17] | French: | Méthode efficace de calcul aléatoire d'adresses (hashing) | [2000/17] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 28.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.12.2006 | BE | 06.12.2006 | CH | 06.12.2006 | CY | 06.12.2006 | DK | 06.12.2006 | FI | 06.12.2006 | IT | 06.12.2006 | LI | 06.12.2006 | NL | 06.12.2006 | SE | 06.03.2007 | GR | 07.03.2007 | ES | 17.03.2007 | PT | 07.05.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2008/21] | AT | 06.12.2006 | |
BE | 06.12.2006 | ||
CH | 06.12.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
FI | 06.12.2006 | ||
IT | 06.12.2006 | ||
LI | 06.12.2006 | ||
NL | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.03.2007 | ||
GR | 07.03.2007 | ||
ES | 17.03.2007 | ||
PT | 07.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/17] | AT | 06.12.2006 | |
BE | 06.12.2006 | ||
CH | 06.12.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
FI | 06.12.2006 | ||
IT | 06.12.2006 | ||
LI | 06.12.2006 | ||
NL | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.03.2007 | ||
ES | 17.03.2007 | ||
PT | 07.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 06.12.2006 | |
BE | 06.12.2006 | ||
CH | 06.12.2006 | ||
FI | 06.12.2006 | ||
LI | 06.12.2006 | ||
NL | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.03.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [PX] - ETZEL M, PATEL S., RAMZAN Z, "Square Hash: Fast Message Authentication Via Optimized Universal Hash Functions", ADVANCES IN CRYPTOLOGY - CRYPTO'99. 19TH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CRYPTOLOGY, Santa Barbara, (19990815), pages 234 - 251, XP002271715 [PX] 1-3 * the whole document * | [A] - HALEVI S, KRAWCZYK H., "MMH: Software Message Authentication in the Gbit/second Rates", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 4TH WORKSHOP ON FAST SOFTWARE ENCRYPTION, 4TH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP, HAIFA, ISRAEL, Berlin, (19970120), vol. 1267, pages 172 - 189, XP002271714 [A] 1-3 * paragraph [03.1] * * paragraph [03.2] * | [A] - JUENEMAN R R, "Message Authentication Code", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, (198509), vol. 23, no. 9, pages 29 - 40, XP002272092 [A] 1-3 * Downloaded from http://dl.comsoc.org/cocoon/comsoc/servlets/GetPublication?id=147308; page 38 - page 39 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.1985.1092643 | [A] - PRENEEL B, "CRYPTOGRAPHIC HASH FUNCTIONS", EUROPEAN TRANSACTIONS ON TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND RELATED TECHNOLOGIES, AEI, MILANO, IT, (19940701), vol. 5, no. 4, ISSN 1120-3862, pages 17 - 34, XP000460559 [A] 1-3 * page 28, column 2 * | [A] - GIRAULT M, "Hash-functions using modulo-N operations", ADVANCES IN CRYPTOLOGY- EUROCRYPT. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON THE THEORY AND APPLICATION OF CRYPTOGRAPHIC TECHNIQUES, SPRINGER VERLAG, DE, (19870413), pages 217 - 226, XP002191869 [A] 1-3 * page 218 * | [A] - KNUTH, D E, The Art of Computer Programming, vol. 2: Seminumerical Algorithms, READING, MASSACHUSETTS, USA, ADDISON WESLEY, (1980), XP002271716 [A] 1-3 * 2nd edition; page 10 - page 11 * * page 26 - page 27 * |