EP0995769 - Method for production of water-soluble conducting polyaniline [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.2004 [2004/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | For all designated states Nippon Shokubai Co., Ltd. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, Shoji Nippon Shokubai Tsukubaryo, 18-21, Koyadai 2-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0074 / JP | 02 /
Murata, Kazuhiko 2-6-10-301, Koshienguchi Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 663-8113 / JP | 03 /
Aizawa, Ryuji 8-1-304, Inodai 3-chome Toride-shi, Ibaraki 302-0015 / JP | 04 /
Asako, Yoshinobu 2-18-11, Higashisonodacho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661-0953 / JP | [2000/17] | Representative(s) | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99308285.8 | 20.10.1999 | [2000/17] | Priority number, date | JP19980301251 | 22.10.1998 Original published format: JP 30125198 | JP19980301252 | 22.10.1998 Original published format: JP 30125298 | [2000/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0995769 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0995769 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/02, H01B1/12 | [2000/17] | CPC: |
H01B1/128 (EP,US);
C08G61/12 (KR);
C08G73/0266 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/02] |
Former [2000/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von wasserlöslichem leitfähigem Polyanilin | [2000/17] | English: | Method for production of water-soluble conducting polyaniline | [2000/17] | French: | Procédé de préparation de polyaniline électroconductrice et soluble dans l'eau | [2002/51] |
Former [2000/17] | Procédé de preparation de polyaniline électroconductrice et soluble dans l'eau | Examination procedure | 06.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 27.10.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 13.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.11.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0813212 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [X] 1-17 * examples 1-4; claims 1,4 *; | [AD] - YUE J ET AL, "COMPARISON OF DIFFERENT SYNTHETIC ROUTES FOR SULPHONATION OF POLYANILINE", POLYMER,GB,JORDAN HILL, OXFORD, vol. 33, no. 20, ISSN 0032-3861, page 4410-4418, XP002060636 [AD] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0032-3861(92)90288-8 |