EP1002951 - A reed for use in a valve assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arctic Circle Limited Coldnose Court, Coldnose Road, Rotherwas Industrial Estate Hereford HR2 6JL / GB | [2006/23] |
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states Arctic Circle Limited Coldnose Court, Coldnose Road, Rotherwas Industrial Estate Hereford HR2 6JL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lawson, Stuart 111 Bath Road Thatcham, Berkshire RG18 3BH / GB | [2000/21] | Representative(s) | Jones, Graham Henry Graham Jones & Company 77 Beaconsfield Road Blackheath, London SE3 7LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | Jones, Graham H. Graham Jones & Company Blackheath 77 Beaconsfield Road London SE3 7LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 99308362.5 | 22.10.1999 | [2000/21] | Priority number, date | GB19980025550 | 20.11.1998 Original published format: GB 9825550 | [2000/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1002951 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1002951 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | [2003/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1002951 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F04B39/10, F16K15/16 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
F04B39/1073 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/21] | Title | German: | Zunge für ein Blattventil | [2000/21] | English: | A reed for use in a valve assembly | [2000/21] | French: | Lame pour soupape à lamelle | [2000/21] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 04.05.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.04.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.06.2006 | BE | 07.06.2006 | CH | 07.06.2006 | CY | 07.06.2006 | FI | 07.06.2006 | FR | 07.06.2006 | IT | 07.06.2006 | LI | 07.06.2006 | NL | 07.06.2006 | DK | 07.09.2006 | SE | 07.09.2006 | DE | 08.09.2006 | GR | 08.09.2006 | ES | 18.09.2006 | LU | 22.10.2006 | IE | 23.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | PT | 07.11.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
DE | 08.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
LU | 22.10.2006 | ||
IE | 23.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
DE | 08.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
IE | 23.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/17] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
DE | 08.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
IE | 23.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 07.09.2006 | |
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 07.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB860008 (JOHN COURTNEY FISHER) [X] 1,2,7,9,10 * figure 7 * [Y] 3-6,8; | [DY]GB2161583 (PRESTCOLD LTD) [DY] 3-6,8* the whole document * |