EP1096099 - Wooden blind slats and method for making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2005 [2005/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIEN MADE ENTERPRISE CO., LTD. 11, Kung-chu Road, Hou liao Village, Fan Yuan Hsiang Changhua / TW | [2001/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nien, Ming no.161, Lu Tung Road, Ting Ts uo Li, Lu Kang Chen Changhua Hsien / TW | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/37] | Nash, David Allan, et al Haseltine Lake Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2001/18] | Bond, Bentley George, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99308427.6 | 25.10.1999 | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1096099 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/386 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
E06B9/386 (EP);
B32B21/14 (EP);
B32B3/14 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/18] | Title | German: | Jalousielatte aus Holz und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [2001/18] | English: | Wooden blind slats and method for making same | [2001/18] | French: | Latte en bois pour jalousie et procédé de fabrication | [2001/18] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 02.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/16] | 16.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5896903 (CHEN FENG-YUAN ET AL) [X] 1-3,5-8 * the whole document * [Y] 4; | [XY]US5332461 (HUESLER BEAT) [X] 8 * the whole document * [Y] 4; | [X]US2275975 (MC CLONE) [X] 8 * the whole document *; | [XY]US2926729 (ZANINI) [X] 8 * the whole document * [Y] 4 |