EP0997793 - Transfer apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/18] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wakahara, Shirou Raporu Sakura A201, 2-3-18 Omote-cho Sakura-shi, Chiba / JP | 02 /
Oikawa, Tomohiro 6-8-5 Takahama, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | 03 /
Kamei, Yukikazu Mezonetto Goi A-103, 2560-1 Goi Ichihara-shi, Chiba / JP | 04 /
Ohnishi, Hideki 1-37-9 Satsukigaoka, Hanamigawa-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | 05 /
Doshoda, Hiroshi Raporu Honda A223, 2-24-7 Honda-cho, Midori-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | [2000/18] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/18] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99308440.9 | 26.10.1999 | [2000/18] | Priority number, date | JP19980306553 | 28.10.1998 Original published format: JP 30655398 | [2000/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0997793 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0997793 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | [2001/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/16 | [2000/18] | CPC: |
G03G15/1675 (EP,US);
G03G2215/1614 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/16] |
Former [2000/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bildübertragungsgerät | [2000/18] | English: | Transfer apparatus | [2000/18] | French: | Appareil de transfert | [2000/18] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/04] | 26.01.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 10.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/13] | 31.01.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | EP03001756.0 / EP1310836 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.03.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]EP0367157 (CANON KK [JP]) [DX] 1-7 * page 3, line 52 - page 4, line 27; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US5450180 (OHZEKI YUKIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * column 5, lines 12-63; figure 1 *; | [X]US5729810 (BERGEN RICHARD F [US], et al) [X] 1-7* column 7, lines 12-59; figures 4,5 * |