EP0997161 - Cardiac electrode having a partially insulated needle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.12.2004 [2004/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON, INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville, NJ 08876 / US | [2000/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shchervinsky, Semyon 6 Menlo Drive Whitehouse Station, New Jersey 08889 / US | [2000/18] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/18] | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99308561.2 | 28.10.1999 | [2000/18] | Priority number, date | US19980182723 | 29.10.1998 Original published format: US 182723 | [2000/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0997161 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0997161 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | [2000/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0997161 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05 | [2000/18] | CPC: |
A61N1/0587 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2001/33] |
Former [2000/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Herzelektrode mit teilweise isolierter Nadel | [2000/18] | English: | Cardiac electrode having a partially insulated needle | [2000/18] | French: | Electrode cardiaque munie d'une aiguille partiellement isolée | [2000/18] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/27] | 23.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4010756 (DUMONT JACQUES, et al) [AD] 1,2 * column 2, line 26 - column 4, line 10; figure - *; | [AD]US4442840 (WOJCIECHOWICZ JR ALEXANDER [US]) [AD] 1,2 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 34; figure - *; | [A]US4541440 (PARSONNET VICTOR [US]) [A] 1,2* column 3, line 45 - column 7, line 55; figure - *; | [AD]US4630617 (RITTER THOMAS A [US], et al) [AD] 1-3,7 * column 2, line 63 - column 4, line 36; figure - *; | [A]WO9309840 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 4, line 33 - page 7, line 19; figure - * | by applicant | US4010756 | US4442840 | US4630617 | US5795178 |