EP1000969 - Antistatic agent for synthetic polymer materials and method of application thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.2003 [2003/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takemoto Yushi Kabushiki Kaisha 2-5, Minato-machi Gamagouri-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states Takemoto Yushi Kabushiki Kaisha 2-5, Minato-machi Gamagouri-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Masahiro, c/o Takemoto Yushi KK 2-5 Minato-machi Gamagouri-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | Ablewhite, Alan James Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | Ablewhite, Alan James MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 99308837.6 | 05.11.1999 | [2000/20] | Priority number, date | JP19980321176 | 12.11.1998 Original published format: JP 32117698 | JP19990287470 | 08.10.1999 Original published format: JP 28747099 | [2000/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1000969 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1000969 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/50, C08K5/42, C08K5/00, C08K5/103 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
C08K5/50 (EP,US);
C08K5/0075 (EP,US);
Y10S524/911 (EP,US);
Y10S524/912 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/05] |
Former [2000/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Antistatikmittel für syntetische Polymermaterialien und dessen Anwendungsmethode | [2000/20] | English: | Antistatic agent for synthetic polymer materials and method of application thereof | [2000/20] | French: | Agent antistatique pour matière polymère synthétique et sa méthode d'utilisation | [2000/20] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 25.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4943380 (SUGIURA MASATO [JP], et al) [AD] 1-13* example -; table - *; | [X]US5449709 (IMAE YOSHIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-13 * claims 1-4; table 2 * |