EP1070529 - Fuel filter cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stanadyne Corporation 92 Deerfield Road Windsor Connecticut 06095 / US | [2006/26] |
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states Stanadyne Corporation 92 Deerfield Road Windsor, Connecticut 06095 / US | ||
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states STANADYNE AUTOMOTIVE CORP. 92 Deerfield Road Windsor Connecticut 06095 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Janik, Leon P. 879 North Street Suffield, Connecticut 06078 / US | 02 /
Williams, Michael J. 144 Hampshire Drive Glastonbury, Connecticut 06033 / US | [2006/18] |
Former [2001/04] | 01 /
Janik, Jeon P. 879 North Street Suffield, Connecticut 06078 / US | ||
02 /
Williams, Michael J. 144 Hampshire Drive Glastonbury, Connecticut 06033 / US | Representative(s) | Piésold, Alexander James, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Piésold, Alexander James, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2005/28] | Piésold, Alexander J., et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [2001/04] | Leale, Robin George Frank B. Dehn & Co.,European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99309038.0 | 12.11.1999 | [2001/04] | Priority number, date | US19990357049 | 19.07.1999 Original published format: US 357049 | [2001/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1070529 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1070529 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01D27/06, B01D27/08 | [2001/04] | CPC: |
B01D27/06 (EP,US);
B01D27/08 (EP);
B01D2201/34 (EP,US);
Y10S277/918 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
B01D27/06, B01D27/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/41] |
Former [2001/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Filterpatrone für Kraftstoff | [2001/04] | English: | Fuel filter cartridge | [2001/04] | French: | Elément filtrant pour carburant | [2001/04] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/14] | 25.07.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 24.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.09.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0658362 (STANADYNE AUTOMOTIVE CORP [US]) [X] 1,5,8,9,11-13,17,19-23 * column 6, line 47 - line 56 * * column 7, line 30 - line 48 * * figures 1,2; claim - * [Y] 2,18; | [YA]US5587066 (COVINGTON EDWARD A [US]) [Y] 2,18 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 2 * * column 6, line 50 - line 56 * * figure - * [A] 3,4; | [A]EP0657198 (STANADYNE AUTOMOTIVE CORP [US]) [A] 1-23 * abstract * * column 5, line 16 - line 58 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0532161 (STANADYNE AUTOMOTIVE CORP [US]) [A] 1-23 * column 6, line 25 - line 47 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0341349 (UNIVERSAL FILTER SPA [IT]) [A] 1-20 * column 3, line 5 - line 10 * * figure 1 * |