EP1006435 - A memory operated in a modified ping-pong mode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.09.2001 [2001/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/23] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seery, James W. 6 Juniper Avenue Manalapan, New Jersey 07726 / US | [2000/23] | Representative(s) | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/23] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 99309306.1 | 23.11.1999 | [2000/23] | Priority number, date | US19980204573 | 03.12.1998 Original published format: US 204573 | [2000/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1006435 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F5/06 | [2000/23] | CPC: |
G06F5/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/08] |
Former [2000/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ein Speicher, welcher in einem geänderten ping-pongmodus funktioniert | [2000/23] | English: | A memory operated in a modified ping-pong mode | [2000/23] | French: | Une mémoire fonctionant en mode ping-pong modifié | [2000/23] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 20.07.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/37] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0211385 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1-7 * column 5, line 10 - column 6, line 8; figure 4 *; | [A]JPS607529 ; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850528), vol. 009, no. 122, Database accession no. (P - 359), & JP60007529 A 19850116 (MITSUBISHI DENKI KK) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - GOERTZEL ET AL, "Variable delay line", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., IBM CORP. NEW YORK., US, (197906), vol. 22, no. 1, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 419 - 420, XP002132323 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * |