EP1005044 - Information recording medium, information recording apparatus and information reproducing apparatus and corresponding methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/22] | Information recording medium, information recording apparatus and information reproducing apparatus | ||
[2012/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 1-1, Shin-ogura Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-0031 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 1-1, Shin-ogura Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-0031 / JP | ||
Former [2000/22] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sawabe, Takao Pioneer Corp. No. 4-1 Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Kaoru Pioneer Corp. Sougou Kenkyusho No.6-1-1 Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Tozaki, Akihiro Pioneer Corp. Sougou Kenkyusho No.6-1-1 Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [2012/52] |
Former [2000/22] | 01 /
Sawabe, Takao Pioneer Corp., No. 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | ||
02 /
Yamamoto, Kaoru Pioneer Corp., Sougou Kenkyusho, No.6-1-1 Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Tozaki, Akihiro Pioneer Corp., Sougou Kenkyusho, No.6-1-1 Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2012/32] |
Former [2000/22] | Brunner, Michael John GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99309371.5 | 24.11.1999 | [2000/22] | Priority number, date | JP19980334828 | 25.11.1998 Original published format: JP 33482898 | [2000/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1005044 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1005044 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | [2000/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1005044 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/10, G11B27/30, G11B20/10 | [2000/22] | CPC: |
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B20/12 (KR);
G11B20/00007 (EP,US);
G11B20/10527 (EP,US);
G11B27/005 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/3027 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US);
G11B2220/90 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/37] |
Former [2000/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Informationsaufzeichnungsmedium, Informationsaufzeichnungsgerät und Informationswiedergabegerät und entsprechende Verfahren | [2012/21] | English: | Information recording medium, information recording apparatus and information reproducing apparatus and corresponding methods | [2012/21] | French: | Support d'enregistrement d'information, appareil d'enregistrement d'information et appareil de reproduction d'information et méthodes correspondantes | [2012/21] |
Former [2000/22] | Informationsaufzeichnungsmedium, Informationsaufzeichnungsgerät und Informationswiedergabegerät | ||
Former [2000/22] | Information recording medium, information recording apparatus and information reproducing apparatus | ||
Former [2000/22] | Support d'enregistrement d'information, appareil d'enregistrement d'information et appareil de reproduction d'information | Examination procedure | 20.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/25] | 22.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.09.2012 | 06.09.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2006 | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0677961 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-11 * abstract * * column 10, line 16 - line 17 * * column 13, line 15 - column 14, line 12 * * column 16, line 41 - column 17, line 18 * * column 19, line 3 - column 20, line 10 * * figures 1-4,9-14,23-26 *; | [A]EP0689206 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 20, line 57 - page 21, line 5 ** figure 1 *; | [X]EP0724264 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * column 24, line 37 - column 26, line 33 * * column 33, line 26 - column 37, line 56 * * figures 6,17,18,21,22,25,26,35,42 *; | [X]EP0738078 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-11 * abstract * * column 27, line 56 - column 30, line 7 * * column 35, line 40 - column 37, line 36 * * figures 1,6-9,43,44,48,59,63-65 *; | [X]EP0737980 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-11 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0788094 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-11 * abstract * * column 14, line 15 - line 37 * * column 18, line 4 - line 44 * * column 24, line 18 - line 38 * * figures 4B,5-7,9,10A,12B,24 * | by applicant | EP0677961 |