EP1006443 - A method of and an apparatus for conventing an event of a distributed application and recording madia for storing the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.08.2003 [2003/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/23] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Yoshio 64-26-201, Hino-2-chome, Konan-ku Yokohama-shi / JP | 02 /
Matsumura, Eiji 39-5-504, Miyamotocho-2-chome, Minami-ku Yokohama-shi / JP | [2000/23] | Representative(s) | Hackney, Nigel John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/23] | Hackney, Nigel John, et al Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 99309498.6 | 29.11.1999 | [2000/23] | Priority number, date | JP19980338555 | 30.11.1998 Original published format: JP 33855598 | [2000/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1006443 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/23] | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46 | [2000/23] | CPC: |
G06F9/542 (EP);
G06F9/465 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Umsetzen eines Ereignis von einer verteilten Anwendung und Speichermedien zur Speicherung des Verfahrens | [2000/23] | English: | A method of and an apparatus for conventing an event of a distributed application and recording madia for storing the method | [2000/23] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour convertir un évenement d'une application distribuée, et support pour stocker le procédé | [2000/23] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/23] | 02.06.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |