EP1017198 - Improved data network for real time information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA | ||
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | ||
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states NORTEL NETWORKS CORPORATION World Trade Center of Montreal 380 St. Antoine Street West 8TH FLOOR Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Himbeault, Lee C. 6 Shannon Terrace SW Calgary, Alberta T2Y 2Y7 / CA | 02 /
Wollensak, Martin 48 Mattamy Place Nepean, Ontario K2G 6K1 / CA | 03 /
Sensyshyn, Paul Andrew 23 Shandon Avenue Nepean, Ontario K2J 4E1 / CA | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Loven, Keith James, et al Loven Patents & Trademarks West Central Runcorn Road Lincoln LN6 3QP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Loven, Keith James, et al Loven & Co Quantum House 30 Tentercroft Street Lincoln LN5 7DB / GB | ||
Former [2000/27] | Dearling, Bruce Clive, et al Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley, Merlin House, Falconry Court, Bakers Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99309603.1 | 30.11.1999 | [2000/27] | Priority number, date | US19980223991 | 31.12.1998 Original published format: US 223991 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1017198 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1017198 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/413, H04L12/64 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
H04L12/4015 (EP,US);
H04L12/413 (EP,US);
H04L12/64 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/13] |
Former [2000/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbessertes Datennetz für Echtzeitnachrichten | [2000/27] | English: | Improved data network for real time information | [2000/27] | French: | Réseau de données amélioré pour les informations temps réel | [2000/27] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 11.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/49] | 28.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - ULUSOY O, "Network access protocol for hard real-time communication systems", COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, AMSTERDAM, (19951201), vol. 18, no. 12, ISSN 0140-3664, pages 943 - 948, XP004032425 [X] 1,3,6,10,14,15 * page 944, column R, line 8 - page 945, column L, line 20 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0140-3664(96)81593-3 | [A] - JIA F ET AL, "The superchannel scheme for integrated services on multiple access broadcast networks", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS,NL,NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, (19951001), vol. 27, no. 11, ISSN 0169-7552, pages 1523 - 1543, XP004002502 [A] 1,3,5,6,8,10,14,15 * page 1525, column L, line 2 - page 1526, column L, line 8 * * page 1527, column L, line 38 - page 1528, column L, line 10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-7552(95)00103-E |