EP1008551 - Method for making a catalyst composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Corporation 2200 West Salzburg Road Auburn, MI 48611 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION 2200 West Salzburg Road Auburn, MI 48611 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eglin, David 77, rue de Paris 77200 Torcy / FR | 02 /
Habimana, Jean de la Cro 199 bis, Chaussee d'Ecoussinnes 7090 Braine le Comte / BE | 03 /
O'Hare, Sarah 3 St. David Avenue Dinas Powys CF64 4JP / GB | 04 /
Taylor, Richard 11 St. Pauls Avenue Barry CF63 8HT / GB | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Williams, Paul Edwin Dow Corning Limited Cardiff Road Barry South Glamorgan CF63 2YL Wales / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | Williams, Paul Edwin Dow Corning Limited, Cardiff Road, Barry South Glamorgan CF63 2YL, Wales / GB | Application number, filing date | 99309659.3 | 01.12.1999 | [2000/24] | Priority number, date | GB19980027055 | 09.12.1998 Original published format: GB 9827055 | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1008551 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1008551 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | [2000/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C01B21/098, C08G77/08 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
C08G77/08 (EP,US);
C01B21/098 (EP,US);
C01B21/0986 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer katalytischen Zusammensetzung | [2000/24] | English: | Method for making a catalyst composition | [2000/24] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'une composition catalytique | [2000/24] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/02] | 23.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/41] | 10.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | SU2545111 [ ] (MENDELEEV, D. I., CHEMICAL-TECHNOLOGICAL INSTITUTE, MOSCOW); | [PX]EP0927576 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [PX] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2279945 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 7, line 21 - page 9, line 23; claim - *; | [A]EP0285091 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [A] 7,10 * the whole document *; | [DA]US3839388 (WOHLFARTH E, et al) | [A] - HAMMOUTOU P Y ET AL, "DIFFERENCIATION PAR L'ANION DE LA REACTION DE DEUX SELS AYANT UN CATION COMMUN: ACTION DE L'HEXAMETHYLDISILAZANE SUR LE CHLORURE ET L'HEXACHLOROPHOSPATHE D'HEXACHLORODIPHOSPHAZONIUM", PHOSPHORUS, SULFUR AND SILICON AND THE RELATED ELEMENTS,GB,GORDON AND BREACH SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, (1993), vol. 79, no. 1/04, ISSN 1042-6507, pages 97 - 106, XP000872426 [A] 1-6 * page 105, paragraph L - page 106, paragraph 4 * | [A] - ZHIVUKHIN, S. M. ET AL, "Phosphonitrile chlorides", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19700615), vol. 72, no. 24, Database accession no. 123535, XP002140113 [A] 1-6 * abstract * |