EP1006702 - Method and apparatus providing for an improved VRRP (Virtual Router Redundancy Protocol) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor Montreal Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | ||
Former [2000/23] | For all designated states NORTEL NETWORKS CORPORATION World Trade Center of Montreal 380 St. Antoine Street West 8TH FLOOR Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Srikanth, Ayikudy K 147 Grove Street Reading, Massachusetts 01867 / US | 02 /
Mujeeb, Hamayon 70 Boston Rd G322 Chelmsford, Massachusetts 01824 / US | 03 /
Meehan, Tom 178 Suffolk Street Apt 5 New York, 10002 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [2000/23] | 01 /
Srikanth, Ayikudy K 147 Grove Street Reading, Massachusetts 01867 / US | ||
02 /
Mujeeb, Hamayon 70 Boston Rd #G322 Chelmsford, Massachusetts 01824 / US | |||
03 /
Meehan, Tom 178 Suffolk Street Apt 5 New York, 10002 / US | Representative(s) | Coyle, Philip Aidan, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | Coyle, Philip Aidan, et al F. R. KELLY & CO. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2000/23] | Dearling, Bruce Clive, et al Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley, Merlin House, Falconry Court, Bakers Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99309720.3 | 03.12.1999 | [2000/23] | Priority number, date | US19980205084 | 04.12.1998 Original published format: US 205084 | [2000/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1006702 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1006702 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | [2000/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/14, H04L12/56 | [2000/23] | CPC: |
H04L45/28 (EP);
H04L45/00 (EP);
H04L45/58 (EP);
H04L49/552 (EP);
H04L69/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/09] |
Former [2000/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung für ein verbessertes VRRP (Virtual Router Redundancy Protocol) | [2000/23] | English: | Method and apparatus providing for an improved VRRP (Virtual Router Redundancy Protocol) | [2000/23] | French: | Méthode et procédé pour un VRRP (Virtual Router Redundancy Protocol) amélioré | [2000/23] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 23.09.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5473599 (LI ANTHONY J [US], et al) [Y] 2,4-6,9 * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 39 * [A] 1,13; | [XAY]US5815668 (HASHIMOTO AKIRA [JP]) [X] 1,3,10-13 * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 36 * [A] 7,8 [Y] 2,4-6,9; | [A]US5835696 (HESS GARY C [US]) [A] 1,13 * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 64 *; | [DA] - S. KNIGHT ET AL, "Virtual Router Redundancy Protocol", NETWORK WORKING GROUP, RFC 2338, (199804), pages 1 - 27, URL: ftp://ftp.isi.edu/in-notes/rfc2338.txt, (20000410), XP002135272 |