EP1106222 - Leverage mechanism for toys [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abl Innovation Co., Ltd. 2F, No. 53, Cheng-I-Nan Rd. San-Chung City Taipei Hsien / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states Abl Innovation Co., Ltd. 2F, No. 53, Cheng-I-Nan Rd. San-Chung City, Taipei Hsien / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Hwa-Lo 4F, 15,Sec 2 Hsin-I Rd Taipei City / TW | [2007/32] |
Former [2001/24] | 01 /
Chen, Hwa-Lo 4F,#15,Sec 2 Hsin-I Rd Taipei City / TW | Representative(s) | Leale, Robin George Frank B. Dehn & Co.,European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [2001/24] | Application number, filing date | 99309881.3 | 08.12.1999 | [2001/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1106222 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A63H29/08, G09F19/02, G09F19/08 | [2001/24] | CPC: |
A63H29/08 (EP);
G09F19/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/10] |
Former [2001/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hebelsystem für einen spielzeug | [2001/24] | English: | Leverage mechanism for toys | [2001/24] | French: | Mécanisme à levier pour un jouet | [2001/24] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/39] | 18.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2002/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.01.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 24.01.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4828530 (LEE YEONG R [TW]) [A] 1-6 * column 1, line 54 - line 67 * * column 2, line 1 - line 40 * * figures 2,9,8 *; | [A]US5483763 (LIU JIAN H [TW]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2230468 (KIM DOUGLAS TAEK) [A] 1-6 * page 4, line 24 - line 26 * * page 5, line 1 - line 19 * * figures 1,6,7 *; | [A]US5040319 (WANG KUANG C [TW], et al) [A] 7 * column 6, line 34 - line 67 * * column 7, line 1 - line 42 * * figures 6,8,9 * |