EP1018789 - Upgradeable communication connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.03.2004 [2004/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arnett, Jamie Ray 407 Oakham Place Fishers, IN 46038 / US | [2000/28] | Representative(s) | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | ||
Former [2000/28] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 99309991.0 | 10.12.1999 | [2000/28] | Priority number, date | US19980221093 | 28.12.1998 Original published format: US 221093 | [2000/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1018789 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1018789 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01R24/00 | [2000/28] | CPC: |
H01R13/6466 (EP,US);
H01R13/6464 (EP);
H01R24/64 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/13] |
Former [2000/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Erweiterbarer Kommunikationsverbinder | [2000/28] | English: | Upgradeable communication connector | [2000/28] | French: | Connecteur de communication évolutif | [2000/28] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/11] | 13.01.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) IT | 04.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.02.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5679027 (SMITH ROBERT JAMES EDWARD [GB]) [A] 1-11 * column 2, line 11 - column 4, line 5; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO9719499 (WHITAKER CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]EP0709930 (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [AD]US5647767 (SCHEER PETER L [US], et al) [AD] 1-11 * abstract *; | [AD]US5674093 (VADEN STERLING A [US]) [AD] 1-11 * abstract * |