EP1020989 - Temperature compensated amplifier and operating method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAYTHEON COMPANY 870 Winter Street Waltham MA 02451-1449 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/16] | For all designated states Raytheon Company 870 Winter Street Waltham, Massachusetts 02451-1449 / US | ||
Former [2000/29] | For all designated states Raytheon Company 141 Spring Street Lexington, Massachusetts 02173 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goff, Miles E. 338 Bedford Road Carlisle, Massachusetts 01741 / US | [2000/29] | Representative(s) | Jackson, David Spence Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/29] | Jackson, David Spence REDDIE & GROSE 16, Theobalds Road London, WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99310001.5 | 13.12.1999 | [2000/29] | Priority number, date | US19980211119 | 14.12.1998 Original published format: US 211119 | [2000/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1020989 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1020989 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | [2003/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1020989 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/30, H03G3/00 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
H03F1/306 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/29] | H03F1/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/29] | Title | German: | Temperaturkompensierter Verstärker und Verfahren zu seinem Betrieb | [2000/29] | English: | Temperature compensated amplifier and operating method | [2000/29] | French: | Amplificateur à compensation thermique et méthode d'opération | [2000/29] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/28] | 06.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.04.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.10.2004 | BE | 06.10.2004 | CH | 06.10.2004 | CY | 06.10.2004 | FI | 06.10.2004 | IT | 06.10.2004 | LI | 06.10.2004 | NL | 06.10.2004 | SE | 06.10.2004 | IE | 13.12.2004 | LU | 13.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | DK | 06.01.2005 | GR | 06.01.2005 | ES | 17.01.2005 | PT | 06.03.2005 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/21] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
BE | 06.10.2004 | ||
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
CY | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
SE | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.12.2004 | ||
LU | 13.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
BE | 06.10.2004 | ||
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
BE | 06.10.2004 | ||
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | CH | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 06.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2925559 (DE SAUTELS ALBERT N) [A] 1-16 * column 1, line 47 - column 4, line 19; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2530099 (TELECOMMUNICATIONS SA [FR]) [A] 1-16* page 4, line 32 - page 8, line 3; figure 1 *; | [X]DE19718109 (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7,12-14,16 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 57; figure 1 * |