EP1010454 - NOx trapping by metal-zirconia materials during lean-burn automotive engine operation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/25] | Nox trapping by metal-zirconia materials during lean-burn automotive engine operation | ||
[2003/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, Inc. 600 Parklane Towers East Dearborn, MI 48331 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/25] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, Inc. 600 Parklane Towers East Dearborn, Michigan 48331 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Narula, Chaitanya Kumar 3741, Richmond Court Ann Arbor, Michigan 48105 / US | 02 /
Nakouzi-Phillips, Sabine Rita 1800, Landsdowne Road Ann Arbor, Michigan 48105 / US | [2000/25] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. Ltd. 43-45 High Road Bushy Heath Bushy Hertfordshire WD23 1EE / GB | ||
Former [2000/25] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. Ltd., 24 Broadway Leigh-on-Sea, Essex SS9 1BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 99310037.9 | 13.12.1999 | [2000/25] | Priority number, date | US19980216459 | 18.12.1998 Original published format: US 216459 | [2000/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1010454 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1010454 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | [2000/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1010454 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/94, B01J37/03, B01J21/06, B01J23/58 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
B01D53/9422 (EP,US);
B01J23/40 (EP,US);
B01J37/033 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1021 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1023 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1025 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2025 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2042 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2063 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20715 (EP,US);
B01J21/066 (EP,US);
B01J23/58 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/25] | B01D53/94 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/31] |
Former [2000/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Speicherung von Stickstoffoxiden durch Metal-Zirconoxidmaterialien während des Betriebs eines mit Luftüberschuss arbeitenden Kraftfahrzeugmotors | [2000/25] | English: | NOx trapping by metal-zirconia materials during lean-burn automotive engine operation | [2003/11] | French: | Accumulation d'oxydes d'azote par métal/zircon matériaux pendant le fonctionnement en mélange pauvre d'un moteur de véhicule automobile | [2000/25] |
Former [2000/25] | Nox trapping by metal-zirconia materials during lean-burn automotive engine operation | Examination procedure | 30.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/22] | 31.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47] | Request for further processing for: | 15.09.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 15.09.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.10.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 31.12.2003 | [2016/09] |
Former [2011/35] | FR | 26.01.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]DE19825207 (DORNIER GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1,4,5,7-10 * column 2, line 7 - column 4, line 12 *; | [A]EP0657204 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1 * page 8, line 21 - page 9, line 1 *; | [A]EP0679427 (RIKEN KK [JP], et al) [A] 1 * page 5, line 40 - page 6, line 30 *; | [A]EP0702997 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [A] 1 * page 2, line 42 - page 3, line 27 * |