EP1014446 - Semiconductor device protected against analysis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2007 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | ||
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsumoto, Hironori 1187-4 Tokujo-cho Nara-shi, Nara / JP | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99310368.8 | 21.12.1999 | [2000/26] | Priority number, date | JP19980362335 | 21.12.1998 Original published format: JP 36233598 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1014446 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1014446 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/58 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
H01L23/573 (EP,US);
H01L27/08 (KR);
H01L27/02 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
Y10S257/922 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2001/11] |
Former [2000/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gegen Analyse geschützte Halbleiteranordnung | [2000/26] | English: | Semiconductor device protected against analysis | [2000/26] | French: | Dispositif semiconducteur protégé contre l'analyse | [2000/26] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 29.12.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE | 29.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.02.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH01165129 ; | [XA]US5369299 (BYRNE ROBERT C [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 52; figure 1 * [A] 6-8,11,12,15 | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890929), vol. 013, no. 437, Database accession no. (E - 826), & JP01165129 A 19890629 (SHARP CORP) [DA] 1,5 * abstract * |