EP1013889 - Axial flow gas turbine engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2006 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.07.2006 [2006/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation United Technologies Building Hartford, Connecticut 06101 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building Hartford, Connecticut 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weiner, Harvey I. 67 Scott Drive South Windsor, CT 06074 / US | 02 /
Demers, Christopher G. 48 Mason Road Willington, CT 06279 / US | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Leckey, David Herbert, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99310420.7 | 22.12.1999 | [2000/26] | Priority number, date | US19980218704 | 22.12.1998 Original published format: US 218704 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1013889 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1013889 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F01D11/08, F01D11/12 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
F01D11/122 (EP,US);
F01D11/025 (EP,US);
F01D11/18 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/11] |
Former [2000/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Axiale Gasturbine | [2000/26] | English: | Axial flow gas turbine engine | [2000/26] | French: | Turbine à gaz axiale | [2000/26] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/08] | 05.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/29] | Request for further processing for: | 23.11.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 23.11.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.12.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1128708 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US5127794 (BURGE JOSEPH C [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US5575145 (O'NEILL BRIAN P [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US4578942 (WEILER WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 1-17 * abstract *; | [A] - STEGEMANN D ET AL, "NACHWEIS KURZZEITIGER ANSTREIFVORGANGE IN DAMPFTURBINEN", VGB KRAFTWERKSTECHNIK,DE,VGB KRAFTWERKSTECHNIK GMBH. ESSEN, (19931001), vol. 73, no. 10, ISSN 0372-5715, pages 853 - 860, XP000398030 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - BOREL M ET AL, "ABRADABLES INCREASE TURBINE BLADE LIFE", REVUE TECHNIQUE SULZER,CH,SULZER FRERES S.A. WINTERTHUR, (19900101), vol. 72, no. 4, pages 7 - 11, XP000227228 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * |