EP1022422 - Marking device in paper money theft proof system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Negoro, Takashi 422, Hata-cho Kishiwada-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/30] | For all designated states Negoro, Takashi 422, Hata-cho Kishiwada-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/30] | Representative(s) | Hillier, Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/30] | Hillier, Peter, et al Reginald W. Barker & Co., Cliffords Inn Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BY / GB | Application number, filing date | 99310438.9 | 22.12.1999 | [2000/30] | Priority number, date | JP19980367188 | 24.12.1998 Original published format: JP 36718898 | [2000/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1022422 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1022422 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E05G1/14, E05G1/00 | [2000/30] | CPC: |
E05G1/14 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/30] | Title | German: | Markiervorrichtung für ein System gegen Banknotendiebstahl | [2000/30] | English: | Marking device in paper money theft proof system | [2000/30] | French: | Dispositif de marquage dans un système contre le vol de billets de banque | [2000/30] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 24.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.04.2003 | BE | 23.04.2003 | CH | 23.04.2003 | FI | 23.04.2003 | IT | 23.04.2003 | LI | 23.04.2003 | NL | 23.04.2003 | DK | 23.07.2003 | GR | 23.07.2003 | PT | 23.07.2003 | SE | 23.07.2003 | ES | 30.10.2003 | CY | 22.12.2003 | IE | 22.12.2003 | LU | 22.12.2003 | MC | 31.12.2003 | [2008/17] |
Former [2005/23] | AT | 23.04.2003 | |
BE | 23.04.2003 | ||
CH | 23.04.2003 | ||
FI | 23.04.2003 | ||
LI | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
CY | 22.12.2003 | ||
IE | 22.12.2003 | ||
LU | 22.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2005/03] | AT | 23.04.2003 | |
BE | 23.04.2003 | ||
CH | 23.04.2003 | ||
FI | 23.04.2003 | ||
LI | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
CY | 22.12.2003 | ||
IE | 22.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 23.04.2003 | |
BE | 23.04.2003 | ||
CH | 23.04.2003 | ||
FI | 23.04.2003 | ||
LI | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
CY | 22.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 23.04.2003 | |
BE | 23.04.2003 | ||
CH | 23.04.2003 | ||
FI | 23.04.2003 | ||
LI | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
CY | 22.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 23.04.2003 | |
BE | 23.04.2003 | ||
CH | 23.04.2003 | ||
FI | 23.04.2003 | ||
LI | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 23.04.2003 | |
CH | 23.04.2003 | ||
FI | 23.04.2003 | ||
LI | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 23.04.2003 | |
CH | 23.04.2003 | ||
FI | 23.04.2003 | ||
LI | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 23.04.2003 | |
CH | 23.04.2003 | ||
LI | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 23.04.2003 | |
LI | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | SE | 23.07.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2035498 (NAVIS PAUL C, et al) [Y] 2,3 * page 2, line 52 - page 3, line 73; figures 7-9 *; | [Y]DE2225437 (BITTNER KARL) [Y] 4,5 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 3 ** page 5, paragraph 5 - page 6, paragraph 1; figures 1,2; claims 1,3,4 *; | [XY]FR2572907 (BULL TRANSAC [FR]) [X] 1 * page 8, line 15 - line 18; figure 1; claims 2,10 * [Y] 2-5 | by applicant | JPH06108741 | JPH079787 |