EP1016422 - Enhanched radiopacity of peripheral and central catheter tubing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.04.2004 [2004/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON, INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville, NJ 08876 / US | [2000/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Solomon, Donald D. 900 Nottingham Cir Southlake, Texas 76092 / US | 02 /
Onwumere, Fidelis C. 1423 Dansbury Drive Mansfield, Texas 76063 / US | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99310485.0 | 23.12.1999 | [2000/27] | Priority number, date | US19980224443 | 31.12.1998 Original published format: US 224443 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1016422 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61L29/06, A61L31/06, C08G18/38, A61L27/18 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
C08G18/381 (EP,US);
A61M25/00 (KR);
A61F2/00 (KR);
A61L27/18 (EP,US);
A61L29/06 (EP,US);
A61L31/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L27/18, C08L75/04 (EP,US);
A61L29/06, C08L75/04 (US,EP);
A61L31/06, C08L75/04 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/27] | Title | German: | Verbesserte Strahlungsundurchlässigkeit von Peripherie- und Zentral- Katheterschläuchen | [2000/27] | English: | Enhanched radiopacity of peripheral and central catheter tubing | [2000/27] | French: | Radiopacité améliorée d'un tube de cathéter périphérique et central | [2000/27] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/06] | 03.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/17] | 18.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8200413 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [A] 1-17 * claim - *; | [X]EP0448886 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 4, line 46 - line 50; claim - *; | [A]EP0452123 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 1-17 * page 3, line 27 - line 58 * * page 4, line 1 - line 45 *; | [A]WO9410936 (TARGET THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1,2* claim - * |