EP0936823 - Switching network for multichannel equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2003/43] |
Former [1999/33] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Robichez, Sabine 94, rue de Fondeville 31400 Toulouse / FR | [1999/33] | Representative(s) | Lamoureux, Bernard, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 Rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/33] | Lamoureux, Bernard, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propriété industrielle 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99400251.7 | 04.02.1999 | [1999/33] | Priority number, date | FR19980001338 | 05.02.1998 Original published format: FR 9801338 | [1999/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0936823 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0936823 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q3/68 | [1999/33] | CPC: |
H04Q3/68 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13003 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1302 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1304 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13046 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1334 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13341 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2000/17] |
Former [1999/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vermittlungsnetzwerk für Mehrkanalverbindungseinrichtungen | [1999/33] | English: | Switching network for multichannel equipment | [1999/33] | French: | Réseau de commutateurs pour installations à canaux multiples | [1999/33] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/16] | 07.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 01.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 23.01.2004 | ES | 02.02.2004 | [2004/46] |
Former [2004/44] | DE | 23.01.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2538656 (LICENTIA GMBH) [A] 1-3 * page 2, line 15 - page 6, line 5 * * figures 1-3 *; | [DA]EP0211541 (WAVECOM [US]); | [DA]EP0599734 (ALCATEL ESPACE [FR]) [DA] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0690636 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0749174 (AEROSPATIALE [FR]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * column 3, line 46 - column 5, line 26 * * figures 1A-2C; claim 1 *; | [PX]FR2752497 (VAILLANT BRUNO [FR]) [PX] 1 * abstract * * page 3, line 12 - page 4, line 33 ** figures 1-4; claims 1-24 * |