EP0945058 - Grid floor for animal husbandry buildings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2000 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aco Produits Polymères "Le Quai à Bois", B.P. 85 27940 Notre Dame de L'Isle / FR | [1999/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miquel, Joseph 32, rue du Puits 27950 Saint Pierre d'Autils / FR | 02 /
Ollivier, Didier 3bis, rue de la Ceriseraie 27930 Aviron / FR | [1999/39] | Representative(s) | Bezault, Jean Cabinet Netter 36, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/39] | Bezault, Jean Cabinet Netter 40, rue Vignon 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99400285.5 | 08.02.1999 | [1999/39] | Priority number, date | FR19980003763 | 26.03.1998 Original published format: FR 9803763 | [1999/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0945058 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A01K1/015 | [1999/39] | CPC: |
A01K1/0151 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/39] | Title | German: | Bodenrost für Tierställe | [1999/39] | English: | Grid floor for animal husbandry buildings | [1999/39] | French: | Plancher à caillebotis pour bâtiment d'élevage d'animaux | [1999/39] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/51] | 03.08.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2812933 (OSTHOFF) [A] 1 * page 5, paragraphs 1-4; figure 1 *; | [A]GB2136472 (NORTON ENGINEERING ALLOYS COMPANY LIMITED) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US3457901 (ABRAHAM) |