EP0938102 - High voltage DC power cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2006 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexans 16, rue de Monceau 75008 Paris / FR | [2001/32] |
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Balog, Georg Endre Martinshaugen 116 3408 Tranby / NO | [1999/34] | Representative(s) | Feray, Valérie, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Feray, Valérie, et al Feray Lenne Conseil 39-41, Avenue Aristide Briand 92163 Antony Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2001/15] | Feray, Valérie, et al Cabinet FERAY/LENNE 44/52, Rue de la Justice 75020 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1999/34] | Buffiere, Michelle Compagnie Financiere Alcatel, DPI, 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99400308.5 | 10.02.1999 | [1999/34] | Priority number, date | NO19980000691 | 19.02.1998 Original published format: NO 980691 | [1999/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0938102 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0938102 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | [2000/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0938102 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01B9/02 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
H01B9/028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DK, GB, IT, NL, SE [2001/27] |
Former [1999/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hochspannungs-Gleichstromenergiekabel | [1999/34] | English: | High voltage DC power cable | [1999/34] | French: | Câble d'énergie pour haute tension et courant continu | [2004/51] |
Former [1999/34] | Câble d'énergie en courant continu pour haute tension | Examination procedure | 18.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/25] | 22.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.05.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/34] | Request for further processing for: | 14.07.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 14.07.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.08.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 14.09.2005 | [2006/22] | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB1445938 (INTENATIONAL STANDARD ELECTRIC) [X] 1 * page 2, line 107 - page 3, line 20; figure 1 * [A] 2-6; | [A]US4256921 (BAHDER GEORGE) [A] 1-6* column 6, line 57 - line 68; figure 3 * |