EP0942542 - Method of signal demodulation for transmitted sequences in a communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Information Technology Centre Europe B.V. Capronilaan 46 1119 NS Schiphol Rijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Information Technology Centre Europe B.V. Capronilaan 46 1119 NS Schiphol Rijk / NL | ||
Former [1999/37] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Information Technology Centre Europe B.V. Keienbergweg 58 1101 AG Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Voyer, Nicolas 80, avenue des Buttes de Coesmes 35700 Rennes / FR | 02 /
MURAI Hideshi 5-1-1- Ofuna, KAMAKURA Kanagawa 247 / JP | [1999/47] |
Former [1999/37] | 01 /
MURAI Hideshi 5-1-1- Ofuna, KAMAKURA Kanagawa 247 / JP | Representative(s) | Maillet, Alain Cabinet Le Guen Maillet 5, place Newquay B.P. 70250 35802 Dinard Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Maillet, Alain Cabinet Le Guen Maillet 5 Place Newquay B.P. 70250 25802 Dinard Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1999/37] | Maillet, Alain Cabinet Le Guen & Maillet, 38, rue Levavasseur, B.P. 91 35802 Dinard Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 99400459.6 | 25.02.1999 | [1999/37] | Priority number, date | FR19980003389 | 13.03.1998 Original published format: FR 9803389 | [1999/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0942542 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0942542 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/216, H04B1/707 | [1999/37] | CPC: |
H04B1/707 (EP,US);
H04J13/004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/21] |
Former [1999/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Signaldemodulation von Übertragenen Sequenzen in einem Übertragungssystem | [1999/37] | English: | Method of signal demodulation for transmitted sequences in a communication system | [1999/37] | French: | Procédé de démodulation de signaux représentatifs de séquences émises dans un système de communications | [1999/37] | Examination procedure | 23.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 16.03.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 19.02.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 29.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 03.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.04.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 23.04.2003 | ES | 30.10.2003 | [2008/17] |
Former [2004/05] | ES | 30.10.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9522859 (MICRILOR INC [US]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * page 15, line 23 - page 16, line 12; figure 13 *; | [DA]US5442627 (VITERBI AUDREY [US], et al) [DA] 1-4 * abstract * * column 4, line 17 - line 45 * * column 7, line 58 - line 62 * * column 9, line 53 - column 10, line 26 * |