EP0953330 - Kit for make-up with a goniochromatical pigment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2011 | Revocation of patent | published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/44] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simon, Jean-Christophe 80, boulevard de Reuilly 75012 Paris / FR | [1999/44] | Representative(s) | Boulard, Denis L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Boulard, Denis L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | ||
Former [2005/41] | Boulard, Denis L'OREAL - D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | ||
Former [1999/44] | Lhoste, Catherine L'OREAL, D.P.I., 6, rue Bertrand Sincholle 92585 Clichy Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 99400663.3 | 18.03.1999 | [1999/44] | Priority number, date | FR19980004581 | 10.04.1998 Original published format: FR 9804581 | [1999/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0953330 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0953330 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | [2000/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0953330 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/02, A61K7/00, A61K7/043 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
A61K8/02 (EP,US);
A61K8/89 (KR);
A61K8/19 (EP,US);
A61K8/23 (EP,US);
A61K8/25 (EP,US);
A61K8/26 (EP,US);
A61K8/27 (EP,US);
A61K8/28 (EP,US);
A61K8/29 (EP,US);
A61K8/31 (EP,US);
A61K8/40 (EP,US);
A61K8/411 (EP,US);
A61K8/4926 (EP,US);
A61K8/4973 (EP,US);
A61K8/585 (EP,US);
A61K8/731 (EP,US);
A61K8/87 (EP,US);
A61K8/922 (EP,US);
A61Q1/00 (EP,US);
A61Q1/02 (EP,US);
A61Q3/02 (EP,US);
A61K2800/42 (EP,US);
A61K2800/436 (EP,US);
A61K2800/438 (EP,US);
A61K2800/88 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1999/44] | A61K7/02, A61K7/043, A61K7/48 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/45] |
Former [1999/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schminkenkit mit einem goniochromatischen Pigment | [2004/47] | English: | Kit for make-up with a goniochromatical pigment | [1999/44] | French: | Kit de maquillage associant un pigment goniochromatique et un pigment monocolore ayant une des couleurs du pigment goniochromatique, ses utilisations | [1999/44] |
Former [1999/44] | Scminkenkit mit einem goniochromatischen Pigment | Examination procedure | 01.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 15.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.02.2006
ADMISSIBLE Beiersdorf AG Intellectual Property - Patente Unnastrasse 48 20253 Hamburg / DE | [2006/13] | 23.03.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.10.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.03.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.04.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 24.03.2011 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/18] | Appeal following opposition | 11.06.2008 | Appeal received No. T1127/08 | 13.08.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.02.2011 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 20.03.2009 | [2010/44] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2750601 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]DE4240743 (CONSORTIUM ELEKTROCHEM IND [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 42-45; claim 9 *; | [A]WO9113125 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 17, lines 16-30; example 9; claim 15 *; | [A]DE19614637 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 21-45; claim 9 * * column 3, lines 37-46 *; | [A] - BASE DE DONNÉES "CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS" (SERVEUR STN), Abrégé 124: 37 399, Colombus, OH, USA; & JP 07 267 820 (SHISEIDO CO. Ltd) 17 OCTOBRE 1995, XP002090282 [A] 1-29 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0815826 |