EP0949092 - Bumper for motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2003 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande Armée 75116 Paris / FR | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [1999/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amdaoud, Rachid 2 Rue Camille St. Saens 78100 St. Germain en Laye / FR | 02 /
Masson, Patrick 31 Allée Etienne Ventenat 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | Lanceplaine, Jean-Claude, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | Lanceplaine, Jean-Claude, et al CABINET LAVOIX 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99400720.1 | 24.03.1999 | [1999/41] | Priority number, date | FR19980004488 | 09.04.1998 Original published format: FR 9804488 | FR19980004490 | 09.04.1998 Original published format: FR 9804490 | [1999/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0949092 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0949092 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60D1/04, B60R19/34, B60D1/50, F16F7/12, B60R19/36 | [1999/41] | CPC: |
B60D1/488 (EP);
B60D1/04 (EP);
B60D1/243 (EP);
B60D1/50 (EP);
B60D1/565 (EP);
B60R19/34 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, PT, SE [2000/26] |
Former [1999/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Stossdämpfer für Kraftfahrzeug | [1999/41] | English: | Bumper for motor vehicle | [1999/41] | French: | Pare-chocs de véhicule automobile | [1999/41] | Examination procedure | 31.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/43] | 12.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 06.06.2002 | SE | 06.06.2002 | ES | 25.09.2002 | [2004/05] |
Former [2003/06] | PT | 06.06.2002 | |
SE | 06.06.2002 | ||
Former [2002/37] | SE | 06.06.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19616944 (SUSPA COMPART AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5 * column 5, lines 40-60; figures 12,13 *; | [A]US3998485 (PUTTER HENNING, et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4272114 (HIRANO TOMOYUKI, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0793035 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4309970 (SORSCHE JOACHIM H, et al) [A] 1 * page 3, lines 4-56; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0794350 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 29 - column 6, line 12; figure 3 *; | [A]FR2357392 (RIEHLE OTTO [DE]) [A] 7 * figures 1-23 *; | [A]US5630605 (SMALLWOOD LEONARD F [US]) [A] 7 * figures 3-6 * |