EP0947416 - Sliding fastening for a plastic element on a support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE PLASTIC OMNIUM 19, avenue Jules Carteret 69007 Lyon / FR | [1999/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gobled, Patrice 1 Route Berthiand 01460 Nurieux / FR | 02 /
Jacquemard, Claude 7 Rue de la Victoire 01100 Oyonnax / FR | 03 /
Courtois, Sébastien 16 rue Belmont 01100 Oyonnax / FR | 04 /
Rossetto, Marc 5 Lotissement les Montaines 39360 Rogna / FR | [1999/40] | Representative(s) | Leszczynski, André Cabinet Nony 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | Leszczynski, André NONY & ASSOCIES 29, rue Cambacérès 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99400757.3 | 29.03.1999 | [1999/40] | Priority number, date | FR19980003964 | 31.03.1998 Original published format: FR 9803964 | [1999/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0947416 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0947416 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B62D29/04 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
B62D29/048 (EP,US);
Y10T403/21 (EP,US);
Y10T403/606 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/24] |
Former [1999/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gleitbefestigung für ein Kunststoffteil auf ein Tragelement | [1999/40] | English: | Sliding fastening for a plastic element on a support | [1999/40] | French: | Fixation glissante d'une pièce en matière plastique sur un support | [1999/40] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 07.04.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 06.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.05.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3456706 (OLLIS RAYMOND JR) [A] 1* column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 3; figures 7,8 *; | [A]US4597153 (ZAYDEL WIESLAW S [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 5; figures 8-12 *; | [A]GB2281260 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB]) [A] 1 * page 10, line 18 - line 25; figure 2 *; | [DA]FR2747091 (RENAULT [FR]) [DA] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | FR2747091 |