EP1050919 - Device for supporting and adjusting a radiocommunication antenna [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.2002 [2002/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pillosio, Raphael 8, Boulevard Henri Ruel 94120 Fontenay sous Bois / FR | For all designated states Pillosio, Guillaume 8, Boulevard Henri Ruel 94120 Fontenay sous Bois / FR | For all designated states Pillosio, Luigi 8, Boulevard Henri Ruel 94120 Fontenay sous Bois / FR | [2000/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/45] | Application number, filing date | 99400969.4 | 21.04.1999 | [2000/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1050919 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/12 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
H01Q3/08 (EP);
H01Q1/1207 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/30] |
Former [2000/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Befestigungs- und Einstellungsvorrichtung für eine Antenne | [2000/45] | English: | Device for supporting and adjusting a radiocommunication antenna | [2000/45] | French: | Dispositif de support et de réglage d'une antenne de radiocommunication | [2000/45] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/20] | 26.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/20] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.07.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.07.2001 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS59218007 ; | [Y]US4825218 (BEGOUT ERIC ET AL) [Y] 1,2,6,7 * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 33; figures 4,5 *; | [A]DE3511465 (KATHREIN WERKE KG) [A] 1 * column 5, line 17 - column 6, line 66; figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB2323714 (LENSON HEATH TRIAX LIMITED) [A] 1 * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 20; figures 1,2 *; | [A]JPS5985103 ; | [A]FR2595510 (CONST CENTRE ATEL) [A] 1 * page 3, line 35 - page 8, line 30; figure 1 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850418), vol. 009, no. 089, Database accession no. (E - 309), & JP59218007 A 19841208 (DEIETSUKUSU ANTENA KK) [Y] 1,2,6,7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840911), vol. 008, no. 198, Database accession no. (E - 265), & JP59085103 A 19840517 (TOSHIBA KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |