EP0959350 - Process for ultrasonic testing of cylindrical pieces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/47] | Process for ultrasonic testing of imersed cylindrical pieces | ||
[2010/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION "SNECMA" 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/37] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION "SNECMA" 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1999/47] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A." 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beffy, Lionel 6 rue Charlie Chaplin 91080 Courcouronnes / FR | 02 /
Fink, Alexandre Mathias 16 rue Edouard Laferrière 92190 Meudon / FR | 03 /
Mangenet, Gérard Yves 13 rue H. de Balzac 91860 Epinay sous Senart / FR | 04 /
Miette, Véronique 105 boulevard Richard Lenoir 75011 Paris / FR | 05 /
Wu, François Jean 11 rue de la Ferme 91400 Orsay / FR | [1999/47] | Representative(s) | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/10] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99401106.2 | 06.05.1999 | [1999/47] | Priority number, date | FR19980005776 | 07.05.1998 Original published format: FR 9805776 | [1999/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0959350 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0959350 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/26, G10K11/34 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
G01N29/341 (EP,US);
G01N29/262 (EP,US);
G01N29/28 (EP,US);
G01N29/30 (EP,US);
G01N2291/02854 (EP,US);
G01N2291/044 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/31] |
Former [1999/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ultraschallprüfverfahren für zylindrische Werkstücke | [2010/15] | English: | Process for ultrasonic testing of cylindrical pieces | [2010/15] | French: | Procédé de contrôle ultrasonore de pièces à géométrie cylindrique | [2010/15] |
Former [1999/47] | Ultraschallprüfverfahren von walzenförmigen Tauchteilen | ||
Former [1999/47] | Process for ultrasonic testing of imersed cylindrical pieces | ||
Former [1999/47] | Procédé de contrôle ultrasonore en immersion de pièces à géométrie cylindrique | Examination procedure | 25.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/47] | 13.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.05.2011 | [2012/17] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0480086 (ACOUSTIC IMAGING TECH [US]) [Y] 1-5 * claims 1,6-9 *; | [DY]EP0598661 (SNECMA [FR]) [DY] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US5457996 (KONDO SHIN-ICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9624053 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [PX]WO9834294 (TERATECH CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1-7 * claims 1-15 *; | [PX]EP0898175 (IMRA EUROPE SA [FR]) [PX] 1-4 * claims 1,2 * |