EP0964206 - Variable geometry gas turbine combustor chamber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.11.2005 [2005/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 1 & 4 avenue de Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | For all designated states Turbomeca 64510 Bordes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 1 & 4 avenue du Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
For all designated states TURBOMECA, Société dite: F-64511 Bordes / FR | |||
Former [1999/50] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
For all designated states TURBOMECA, Société dite: F-64511 Bordes / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grienche, Guy Route de Saint Vincent 64800 Coarraze / FR | 02 /
Schott, Gérard 20, rue du Vieux Bourg 64110 Rontignon / FR | 03 /
Le Gal, Jean-Hervé 15-29 rue Guilleminot 75014 Paris / FR | 04 /
Martin, Gérard 34bis, Avenue de Colmar 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | 05 /
Laborde, Patrice 13, avenue du Château d'Este 64140 Bollène / FR | 06 /
Spagne, Raphael 8,chemin du Bac 64230 Lescar / FR | [1999/50] | Application number, filing date | 99401204.5 | 18.05.1999 | [1999/50] | Priority number, date | FR19980007409 | 11.06.1998 Original published format: FR 9807409 | [1999/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0964206 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0964206 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/26, F23R3/34 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
F23R3/346 (EP,US);
F23R3/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, NL [2000/34] |
Former [1999/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Brennkammer einer Gasturbine mit verstellbarer Geometrie | [1999/50] | English: | Variable geometry gas turbine combustor chamber | [1999/50] | French: | Chambre de combustion de turbine à gaz à géométrie variable | [2004/28] |
Former [1999/50] | Chambre de combustion de turbine à gaz à geométrie variable | Examination procedure | 15.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 15.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3691761 (JACKSON SQUIRE RONALD, et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US3765171 (HAGEN H, et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US3869246 (HAMMOND JR DEAN C, et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]FR2270448 (BENNES MARREL [FR]) [Y] 1-4,8 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4296599 (ADAMSON ARTHUR P) [Y] 1-4,8,9 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0281961 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-4,8 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5159807 (FORESTIER ALEXANDRE [FR]) [Y] 1-4,8,9 * the whole document * |