EP0961060 - Multiple way valve with plug [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2005 [2005/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vygon 5-11 rue Adeline F-95440 Ecouen / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | For all designated states VYGON 5-11 rue Adeline F-95440 Ecouen / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brinon, Thierry 28, rue de Pontoise 95560 Montsoult / FR | [1999/48] | Representative(s) | Schrimpf, Robert, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | Schrimpf, Robert, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 26, Avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99401263.1 | 27.05.1999 | [1999/48] | Priority number, date | FR19980006735 | 28.05.1998 Original published format: FR 9806735 | [1999/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0961060 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16K11/085 | [1999/48] | CPC: |
A61M39/223 (EP);
F16K11/0853 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/32] |
Former [1999/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mehrwegventil mit Küken | [1999/48] | English: | Multiple way valve with plug | [1999/48] | French: | Robinet à boisseau et à clé tournante à voies de communication multiples | [1999/48] | Examination procedure | 22.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 26.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/04] | 26.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2335085 (ARTHUR ROBERTS) [X] 1,3,5 * figures 1-10 *; | [A]GB1357424 (LAUXILIAIRE DE LINDUSTRIE ET D) [A] 1,2,6-8 * figures 1-3 * * page 1, line 25 - line 35 *; | [A]US3115896 (ROBERTS SYLVIA V, et al) [A] 1-3,5,7,8 * figures 1-7 * * column 2, line 51 - line 61 *; | [A]DE4321647 (SUSPA COMPART AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,5,7,8 * abstract * * column 4, line 15 - line 17 *; | [A]FR2088811 (OLIN CORP) [A] 1,2,7,8 * figure 3 * * page 4, line 26 - line 37 *; | [A]WO9626760 (URRUTIA HECTOR [US]) [A] 1,3,7,8 * figures 1,5A,B,C *; | [A]DE3427931 (SCHERER NORBERT) [A] 1,7,8 * abstract *; | [A]US4982760 (MUSTAKLEM ISSA [US]) [A] 1,7,8 * abstract * |