EP0961377 - Cabinet for electrical apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hispano Mecano Electrica S.A. C/Call 64 08786 Capellades (Barcelona) / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states Hispano Mecano Electrica S.A. c/ Call 64 08786 Capellades (Barcelona) / ES | ||
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SA 89 boulevard Franklin Roosevelt 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | ||
Former [1999/48] | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SA 40, avenue André Morizet 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dumont Dipuis, Michel, Ing. Place Joaquin Folguera 3 2ème 08022 Barcelone / ES | 02 /
Niubo Mana, Javier Ing. Rue Serra des Montsec, 28-30 entr 3ème 08950 Esplugas de Llobregat / ES | [1999/48] | Application number, filing date | 99401341.5 | 28.05.1999 | [1999/48] | Priority number, date | FR19980006778 | 28.05.1998 Original published format: FR 9806778 | [1999/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0961377 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H02B1/28 | [1999/48] | CPC: |
H02B1/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR [2000/32] |
Former [1999/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schrank für elektrische Geräte | [1999/48] | English: | Cabinet for electrical apparatus | [1999/48] | French: | Armoire logeant des appareillages électriques | [1999/48] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/07] | 09.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/18] | 27.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0514668 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI) [Y] 1,2,6,8,9 * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 7 * * figures 1,8 *; | [Y]DE9106011U (BADER) [Y] 1,2,6,8,9 * figure 1 * * page 7, paragraph L * * figure 5 *; | [A]GB2313870 (TEGREL LTD) [A] 1 * page 3 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0433262 (LOYD THOMAS) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2550493 (TRUMBULL ELECTRIC MANUFACTURING COMPANY) [A] 1 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR2333407 (DENIZET RENE) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE29620447U (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4678227 (CASTAGNO ALDO) [A] 2 * figure 2 *; | [A]EP0329964 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG) [A] 2 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5380083 (JONES TRENT T ET AL) [A] 7 * column 8, line 49 - line 65 * * figure 7 * |