EP0963132 - Administration process for a network of base stations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/49] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dupuy, Pierre 14 rue Lecluse 75017 Paris / FR | [1999/49] | Representative(s) | El Manouni, Josiane, et al Alcatel-Lucent International Patent Business Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/49] | El Manouni, Josiane, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propr. Industrielle, 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99401343.1 | 04.06.1999 | [1999/49] | Priority number, date | FR19980007009 | 04.06.1998 Original published format: FR 9807009 | [1999/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0963132 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
H04W48/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, GB, IT, SE [2000/33] |
Former [1999/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verwaltung von vernetzten Basisstationen | [1999/49] | English: | Administration process for a network of base stations | [1999/49] | French: | Procédé d'administration d'un réseau de stations de base | [1999/49] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/31] | 13.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/41] | 07.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2724523 (ALCATEL MOBILE COMM FRANCE) [AD] 1-9 * page 3, line 24 - page 6, line 20 * * page 8, line 19 - page 13, line 19 *; | [A]EP0568212 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD) [A] 1,5,8,9 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 20 * * column 4, line 34 - column 5, line 19 *; | [A]EP0369535 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD ;PHILIPS NV (NL)) [A] 1 * column 3, line 17 - column 6, line 7 * |