EP0964369 - Method and arrangement for management by means of an IC-card of a refuse collector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.01.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sulo Applications 142 Avenue de Stalingrad, Parc d'Activité La Corvette 92700 Colombes / FR | [1999/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schiltz, Patrick M., Sulo Applications 142 Avenue de Stalingrad, P d'Activité La Corvette 92700 Colombes / FR | [1999/50] | Representative(s) | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie SCHMIT CHRETIEN 8, Place du Ponceau 95000 Cergy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie SCHMIT CHRETIEN SCHIHIN 8 Place du Ponceau 95000 Cergy / FR | ||
Former [1999/50] | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie Cabinet Christian Schmit et Associes, 8, place du Ponceau 95000 Cergy / FR | Application number, filing date | 99401409.0 | 10.06.1999 | [1999/50] | Priority number, date | FR19980007271 | 10.06.1998 Original published format: FR 9807271 | [1999/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0964369 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/02, G07F7/00, B65F1/14 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
G06Q20/3433 (EP);
B65F1/0033 (EP);
G07F17/0014 (EP);
G07F7/02 (EP);
B65F2210/108 (EP);
B65F2210/184 (EP);
Y02W30/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verwaltung mittels Chipkarten einer Müllsammeleinrichtung | [1999/50] | English: | Method and arrangement for management by means of an IC-card of a refuse collector | [1999/50] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de gestion par carte à puce d'une dechetterie | [1999/50] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 05.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2003/11] | 04.10.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE29602267U (POETTINGER OHG ALOIS ;GEYER JOSEF (DE)) [X] 1-4,6-8 * page 6, line 1 - page 8, line 4; figures 1-3; claims 2,6 *; | [X]DE4413034 (BAUMELER ALAIN ;HELMS JOHANN B (CH); ZISWILER ALOIS (CH); ERBS KAR) [X] 1,3-7 * column 2, line 21 - line 24 * * column 3, line 17 - line 21 *; | [X]EP0642106 (W & R KAUFMANN AG) [X] 1,3-7 * column 3, line 15 - line 29; figure 1 *; | [X]DE29620166U (BACHMANN MATTHIAS DIPL ING) [X] 1,3-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0669270 (LANDOLT ARMIN) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]DE4122405 (SCHAEFER THILO) [A] 1,3-7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3910791 (MERLE BERND DIPL ING ;GARBRECHT FRIEDRICH WILHELM PR (DE)) [A] 1-8 * column 3, line 46 - line 65; figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE19536318 (PHYSIKALISCH TECH STUDIEN GMBH) [A] 1,3-7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4430777 (EBNER RUDOLF ;KARDUM IWE (DE)) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9622238 (BRUNI REMO ;TECNOCAD S R L (IT)) [A] 1,4,5 * abstract * |