EP1061680 - A method for sharing capacity in a CDMA mobile radiocommunication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 16.07.2003 [2003/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2001/51] |
Former [2000/51] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blanc, Patrick 2, Rue Edouard Branly 92130 Issy Les Moulineaux / FR | 02 /
De Montgolfier, Rémi 81, Rue de Sèvres 75006 Paris / FR | [2000/51] | Representative(s) | El Manouni, Josiane, et al Alcatel-Lucent International Patent Business Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/51] | El Manouni, Josiane, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propr. Industrielle, 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99401487.6 | 16.06.1999 | [2000/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1061680 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1061680 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04J11/00, H04Q7/38, H04B7/26 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
H04J13/18 (EP,US);
H04W72/0466 (EP,US);
H04W52/281 (EP,US);
H04W52/34 (EP,US);
H04W74/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, SE [2001/36] |
Former [2000/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Kapazitätsverteilung in einem CDMA Mobilfunksystem | [2000/51] | English: | A method for sharing capacity in a CDMA mobile radiocommunication system | [2000/51] | French: | Méthode pour partager la capacité dans un système de radiocommunication mobile AMCR | [2000/51] | Examination procedure | 08.07.1999 | Examination requested [2000/51] | 09.07.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 03.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 27.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 19.12.2001 | SE | 19.03.2002 | IE | 17.06.2002 | [2003/29] |
Former [2002/33] | FI | 19.12.2001 | |
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 19.03.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9503652 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 13, line 30 - page 17, line 37 *; | [A]EP0831669 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 7 - line 23 * * page 5, line 19 - page 6, line 1 ** page 8, line 8 - line 32 *; | [X] - MO-HAN FONG ET AL, "CONCATENATED ORTHOGONAL/PN SPREADING SCHEME FOR CELLULAR DS-CDMA SYSTEMS WITH INREGRATED TRAFFIC", COMMUNICATIONS - GATEWAY TO GLOBALIZATION. PROCEEDINGS OF THE CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, SEATTLE, JUNE 18 - 22, 1995, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19950618), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7803-2487-0, pages 905 - 909, XP000533131 [X] 1,8,15 * page 908, column R, line 1 - line 18; figure 2 * |