EP0965370 - Amusement game with pinball playfield and combined flipper/four-way switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Williams Electronics Games, Inc. 3401 N. California Avenue Chicago, Illinois 60618 / US | [1999/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Popadiuk, John A. 3401 N. California Avenue Chicago, Illinois 60618 / US | [1999/51] | Representative(s) | Loisel, Bertrand Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | Loisel, Bertrand Cabinet Plasseraud, 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99401515.4 | 18.06.1999 | [1999/51] | Priority number, date | US19980099964 | 19.06.1998 Original published format: US 99964 | [1999/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0965370 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0965370 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | [2001/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A63F7/02 | [1999/51] | CPC: |
A63F7/027 (EP,US);
A63F2007/303 (EP,US);
A63F7/2409 (EP,US);
H01H25/008 (EP,US);
H01H25/041 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/49] |
Former [1999/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Unterhaltungsspiel mit Flipperspielfläche und kombiniertem Flipper-Vierweg-Schalter | [1999/51] | English: | Amusement game with pinball playfield and combined flipper/four-way switch | [1999/51] | French: | Jeu d'amusement avec surface de jeu de flipper et interrupteur de flipper à quatre voies | [1999/51] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/27] | 31.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.11.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.11.2001 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5507488 (EDDY BRIAN R [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9,10,16 * column 3, line 19 - line 30; figure 1 *; | [X]US4373725 (RITCHIE STEVEN S) [X] 1-3,9,10,16 * column 2, line 11 - line 49 *; | [A]US4256931 (PALISEK WILLIAM F) [A] 4,11,17 * column W * | by applicant | US5342049 | US4356142 |