EP0971462 - Mixed connector assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2007 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TCL & ALCATEL MOBILE PHONES LIMITED Room 1502, 15/F.,Tower 6 China Hong Kong City, 33 Canton Road, Tsim Sha Tsui,Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | [2006/28] |
Former [2005/32] | For all designated states TCL & ALCATEL MOBILE PHONES LIMITED Room 1502, 15/F.,Tower 6 China Hong Kong City, 33 Canton Road Tsim Sha Tsui, Kowloon, Hong Kong / CN | ||
Former [2005/31] | For all designated states TAM Holdings Limited Room 1502, 15/F.,Tower 6 China Hong Kong City, 33 Canton Road Tsim Sha Tsui, Kowloon, Hong Kong / CN | ||
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Villain, Jean-Christophe 2, rue Hegesippe Moreau 75018 Paris / FR | [2000/02] | Representative(s) | Feray, Valérie, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Feray, Valérie, et al Feray Lenne Conseil 39-41, Avenue Aristide Briand 92163 Antony Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2005/10] | Feray, Valérie, et al Feray Lenne Conseil 44-52, rue de la Justice 75020 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2000/02] | Lamoureux, Bernard COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propriété industrielle 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99401527.9 | 21.06.1999 | [2000/02] | Priority number, date | FR19980008830 | 09.07.1998 Original published format: FR 9808830 | [2000/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0971462 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0971462 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01R27/02, H01R13/24, H01R13/26 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
H01R13/24 (EP,US);
H01R13/26 (EP,US);
H01R27/02 (EP,US);
H01R13/6271 (EP,US);
H01R31/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FI, GB, IT, LI, SE [2000/38] |
Former [2000/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gemischte Verbinderanordnung | [2000/02] | English: | Mixed connector assembly | [2000/02] | French: | Ensemble de connexion mixte | [2000/02] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/36] | 13.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 12.10.2006 | [2007/21] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9628865 (WHITAKER CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,3-6 * column 6, line 33 - column 9, line 22; figures 4,15,16 *; | [A]EP0701303 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1,3,4 * column 1, line 16 - line 42; figure 1 *; | [DA]WO9736350 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [DA] 1 * abstract * |