EP0967763 - Multicarrier receiver with per-carrier RLS frequency domain equalisation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2005 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2004/49] |
Former [1999/52] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Acker, Kathleen Peggie Florimond Pierstraat 343 2840 Rumst / BE | 02 /
Leus, Geert Stoktrooieweg 38 3511 Hasselt / BE | 03 /
Moonen, Marc R. de Clercqlaan 3 3001 Heverlee / BE | 04 /
Pollet, Thierry Vekestraat 6 2800 Mechelen / BE | 05 /
Van de Wiel, Olivier René Christian Résidence Eden Flore, Av. Maurice Jean-Pierre 13 06110 Le Cannet-Rocheville / FR | [1999/52] | Representative(s) | Plas, Axel Ivo Michel Alcatel Bell N.V., Francis Wellesplein 1 2018 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/52] | Plas, Axel Alcatel Bell N.V., Francis Wellesplein 1 2018 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 99401572.5 | 24.06.1999 | [1999/52] | Priority number, date | EP19980401609 | 29.06.1998 Original published format: EP 98401609 | [2004/48] |
Former [1999/52] | EP19980401609 | 26.06.1998 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0967763 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0967763 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26, H04L25/03 | [1999/52] | CPC: |
H04L25/03159 (EP,US);
H04L27/2651 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03414 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03522 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/36] |
Former [1999/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mehrträgerempfänger mit RLS-Frequenzbereichsentzerrer pro Träger | [1999/52] | English: | Multicarrier receiver with per-carrier RLS frequency domain equalisation | [1999/52] | French: | Récepteur de signaux multiporteuses avec un egaliseur RLS en domaine fréquentiel par porteuse | [1999/52] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 18.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.12.2004 | BE | 01.12.2004 | SE | 01.03.2005 | ES | 12.03.2005 | [2007/21] |
Former [2005/51] | AT | 01.12.2004 | |
BE | 01.12.2004 | ||
ES | 12.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 01.12.2004 | |
ES | 12.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | ES | 12.03.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD] - CHOW P S ET AL, "A MULTICARRIER E1-HDSL TRANSCEIVER SYSTEM WITH CODED MODULATION", EUROPEAN TRANSACTIONS ON TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND RELATED TECHNOLOGIES, (19930501), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 257 - 266, XP000385752 [AD] 1-3 * figure 5 * * page 262, column L, paragraph L * | [A] - FARHANG-BOROUJENY B ET AL, "GENERALIZED SLIDING FFT AND ITS APPLICATION TO IMPLEMENTATION OF BLOCK LMS ADAPTIVE FILTERS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, (19940301), vol. 42, no. 3, pages 532 - 537, XP000450708 [A] 1,6 * page 532 - page 534, column 1; figures 1,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/78.277845 |