EP0978915 - Cableway [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société de Constructions Electriques de la Seine ( CES) 26, rue Jean-Baptiste Potin 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | For all designated states Société de Constructions Electriques de la Seine ( CES) 26, rue Jean-Baptiste Potin 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dufourg, Bernard 59 rue Notre Dame des Champs 75006 Paris / FR | [2000/06] | Representative(s) | Burbaud, Eric Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | Burbaud, Eric Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99401953.7 | 30.07.1999 | [2000/06] | Priority number, date | FR19980009921 | 03.08.1998 Original published format: FR 9809921 | [2000/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0978915 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0978915 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/04 | [2000/06] | CPC: |
H02G3/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/06] | Title | German: | Kabelrinne | [2000/06] | English: | Cableway | [2000/06] | French: | Chemin de cable | [2000/06] | Examination procedure | 07.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/06] | 04.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 18.08.2004 | IE | 18.08.2004 | PT | 18.01.2005 | [2008/17] |
Former [2005/24] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 18.08.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1375765 (ACEC [BE]) [A] 1,2,4 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0813012 (SEINE CONST ELEC [FR]) [DA] 1* figure - * |