EP0980053 - Advanced plastic card for financial and informational transactions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CITIBANK, N.A. 399 Park Avenue New York New York 10043 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/07] | For all designated states CITIBANK, N.A. 399 Park Avenue New York, New York 10043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hooper, William D. 9 Pheasant Run New Hope, PA 18938 / US | [2000/07] | Representative(s) | Loisel, Bertrand Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/07] | Loisel, Bertrand Cabinet Plasseraud, 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99402040.2 | 11.08.1999 | [2000/07] | Priority number, date | US19980096185P | 11.08.1998 Original published format: US 96185 P | [2000/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0980053 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0980053 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10, G07F19/00, G06F17/60, G06K19/07 | [2000/07] | CPC: |
G06K19/0723 (EP);
G06K19/077 (EP);
G06Q20/3415 (EP);
G06Q20/346 (EP);
G06Q30/02 (EP);
G06Q30/04 (EP);
G07F7/1008 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/07] | Extension states | AL | 28.12.1999 | LT | 28.12.1999 | LV | 28.12.1999 | MK | 28.12.1999 | RO | 28.12.1999 | SI | 28.12.1999 | Title | German: | Verbesserte Kunststoffkarte für finanzielle und informative Transaktionen | [2000/07] | English: | Advanced plastic card for financial and informational transactions | [2000/07] | French: | Carte en plastique améliorée pour transactions financières et informatives | [2000/07] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 01.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/39] | 21.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   18.02.2003 | 31.08.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5748737 (DAGGAR ROBERT N [US]) [X] 1-36 * column 7, line 34 - column 8, line 60 * * column 9, line 1 - line 17 * * column 10, line 30 - line 64 * * column 11, line 7 - line 16 * * column 12, line 32 - column 13, line 26 * * column 17, line 1 - line 21 * * column 17, line 66 - column 19, line 3 * * column 20, line 10 - line 19 * * figures 1,2A,4A *; | [X]US5590038 (PITRODA SATYAN G [US]) [X] 1-36 * column 2, line 44 - column 4, line 10 * * column 6, line 16 - line 61 * * column 11, line 12 - line 38 * * column 11, line 65 - column 12, line 6 * * column 9, line 32 - column 10, line 8 * * column 14, line 40 - line 50 * * column 15, line 12 - line 39 * * figures 2-4 *; | [X]WO9825371 (WANG YNJIUN [US]) [X] 1-36 * page 4, line 3 - line 10 * * page 6, line 3 - line 16 * * page 13, line 26 - page 14, line 31 * * figures 2,5C,6A *; | [X]EP0825546 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-36 * column 3, line 20 - column 5, line 9 * * column 10, line 53 - column 11, line 12 * * figure 12 * | by applicant | US5339239 | US5566327 |