EP0981131 - Biaxial actuator, optical part and optical pickup head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2011 [2011/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/08] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kijima, Yoshito c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-Ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Misono, Shigekazu c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-Ku, Tokyo / JP | [2000/08] | Representative(s) | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/08] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99402045.1 | 12.08.1999 | [2000/08] | Priority number, date | JP19980244403 | 14.08.1998 Original published format: JP 24440398 | [2000/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0981131 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/09 | [2000/08] | CPC: |
G11B7/1372 (EP,US);
G11B7/09 (KR);
G11B7/0935 (EP,US);
G11B7/093 (EP,US);
G11B7/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/45] |
Former [2000/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zweiachsige Positioniereinrichtung, optischer Teil und optischer Wiedergabekopf | [2000/08] | English: | Biaxial actuator, optical part and optical pickup head | [2000/08] | French: | Positionneur biaxial, partie optique et tête de lecture optique | [2000/08] | Examination procedure | 08.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 24.08.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 11.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/33] | 04.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.07.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.09.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH03230327 ; | [A]EP0704842 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-22 * abstract * * column 25, line 37 - column 27, line 2 *; | [A]EP0561420 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,3-6,14,16-19 * abstract * * column 4, line 7 - column 5, line 42 *; | [A]JPH10143892 ; | [A]JPS63167434 ; | [A]JPH0991736 ; | [A]JPS6342043 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920113), vol. 016, no. 012, Database accession no. (P - 1297), & JP03230327 A 19911014 (FUJI PHOTO OPTICAL CO LTD) [X] 1,3-5,9,10,14,16-18,22 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10143892 A 19980529 (SANKYO SEIKI MFG CO LTD) [A] 1,10,14 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881118), vol. 012, no. 439, Database accession no. (P - 788), & JP63167434 A 19880711 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,10,14 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970829), vol. 1997, no. 08, & JP09091736 A 19970404 (SHARP CORP) [A] 1,10,14 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880716), vol. 012, no. 253, Database accession no. (P - 731), & JP63042043 A 19880223 (CANON INC) [A] 1,10,14 * abstract * |