EP0984408 - Slot machine with pattern-driven award feature [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2002 Database last updated on 24.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2002 [2002/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WMS GAMING, INC. 3401 North California Avenue Chicago, Illinois 60618 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | For all designated states WMS GAMING, INC. 3401 North California Avenue Chicago, Illinois 60618 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Slomiany, Scott 24 Falstone Drive Streamwood, Illinois 60107 / US | 02 /
Sylla, Craig 247 W. Treehouse Lane Round Lake, Illinois 60073 / US | [2000/10] | Representative(s) | Loisel, Bertrand Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | Loisel, Bertrand Cabinet Plasseraud, 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99402158.2 | 31.08.1999 | [2000/10] | Priority number, date | US19980145599 | 02.09.1998 Original published format: US 145599 | [2000/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0984408 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0984408 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | [2002/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G07F17/32 | [2000/10] | CPC: |
G07F17/3244 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Spielautomat mit Bonusgewinn im Falle der Bildung eines Musters | [2000/10] | English: | Slot machine with pattern-driven award feature | [2000/10] | French: | Machine de jeu avec bonus pour la formation d'un motif | [2000/10] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/43] | 17.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19614114 (ADP GAUSELMANN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,20,21,40 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 13; figure .; claim . *; | [A]GB2316214 (SHOWA YUEN KABUSHIKI KAISHA [JP]) [A] 1,20,21,40 * page 10, line 8 - page 12, line 12; figure - *; | [A]DE3638099 (NSM APPARATEBAU GMBH KG [DE]) [A] 1,20,21,40 * column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 15; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3628745 (GAUSELMANN PAUL [DE]) [A] 1,20,21,40 * column 3, line 43 - column 5, line 26; figure 2 * | by applicant | US5449173 |