EP0997190 - Ellipsoidal adsorbent particles and use thereof in a method for producing gas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.09.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2006 | Refusal of application | published on 18.10.2006 [2006/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2000/18] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Labasque, Jacques 67, rue Jean de la Fontaine 78000 Versailles / FR | 02 /
Moreau, Serge 22, rue du Général Exelmans 78140 Velizy Villacoublay / FR | [2000/18] | Representative(s) | Pittis, Olivier, et al L'Air Liquide, S.A. Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | Pittis, Olivier, et al L'Air Liquide, S.A., Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle, 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2000/18] | Le Moenner, Gabriel, et al L'Air Liquide S.A., DSPI, Service Brevets et Marques, 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99402229.1 | 10.09.1999 | [2000/18] | Priority number, date | FR19980011857 | 23.09.1998 Original published format: FR 9811857 | [2000/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0997190 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/28, B01D53/047, B01J20/18 | [2000/18] | CPC: |
B01J20/2803 (EP,US);
B01D53/02 (EP,US);
B01J20/183 (EP,US);
B01J20/28004 (EP,US);
B01J20/28019 (EP,US);
B01D2253/108 (EP,US);
B01D2253/11 (EP,US);
B01D2253/25 (EP,US);
B01D2253/304 (EP,US);
B01D2253/34 (EP,US);
B01D2256/12 (EP,US);
B01D2256/16 (EP,US);
B01D2256/20 (EP,US);
B01D2256/22 (EP,US);
B01D2256/24 (EP,US);
B01D2256/245 (EP,US);
B01D2257/102 (EP,US);
B01D2257/108 (EP,US);
B01D2257/502 (EP,US);
B01D2257/504 (EP,US);
B01D2257/702 (EP,US);
B01D2257/7025 (EP,US);
B01D2257/80 (EP,US);
B01D53/047 (EP,US);
B01D53/0476 (EP,US);
B01D53/261 (EP,US);
Y02C20/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2001/03] |
Former [2000/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ellipsoidische Adsorbens-Partikel und deren Verwendung in einem Verfahren zur Gaserzeugung | [2000/18] | English: | Ellipsoidal adsorbent particles and use thereof in a method for producing gas | [2000/18] | French: | Particules d'adsorbant ellipsoidales et leur utilisation dans un procédé de production de gaz | [2000/18] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 23.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/42] | 29.05.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.06.2006 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06170232 ; | [A]WO9717132 (PHARMACIA BIOTECH AB [SE], et al) [A] 1 * page 25; claims 9,10 *; | [A]EP0785020 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [A] 8,9,13 * page 5, column 8, line 15 - page 7, column 11, line 57 *; | [A]EP0827771 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [A] 8,9,12 * pages 12-14; claims 1-19 *; | [A]EP0855209 (CECA SA [FR]) [A] 8-11 * page 1, lines 1-19 * * page 3, lines 7-39 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940922), vol. 018, no. 506, Database accession no. (C - 1252), & JP06170232 A 19940621 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |