EP0987071 - Method for increasing radiation and wear resistance of an anti-adhesive layer on an aluminium plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/12] | Method for increasing radiation and wear resistance of an anti-adhesiv layer on an aluminium plate | ||
[2003/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEB S.A. Les 4 M Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | For all designated states SEB S.A. Les 4 M Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brasset, Jean-François Les Promenades du Thion, 23 rue de l'Isernon 74960 Cran Gevrier / FR | [2000/12] | Representative(s) | Somnier, Jean-Louis, et al Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois Perret Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | Somnier, Jean-Louis, et al Novamark Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois Perret Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 99402242.4 | 13.09.1999 | [2000/12] | Priority number, date | FR19980011639 | 17.09.1998 Original published format: FR 9811639 | [2000/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0987071 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0987071 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B21D51/22 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
B23P11/00 (EP);
B21D39/03 (EP);
B21D51/22 (EP);
B23P2700/05 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, IT [2000/49] |
Former [2000/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erhöhung der Radiations- und der Verschleissbeständigkeit einer adhäsiven Beschichtigungszusammensetzung auf einer Aluminiumplatte | [2000/12] | English: | Method for increasing radiation and wear resistance of an anti-adhesive layer on an aluminium plate | [2003/05] | French: | Procédé pour augmenter la résistance à la rayure et à l'usure d'un revètement anti-adhésif appliqué sur une plaque en aluminium | [2000/12] |
Former [2000/12] | Method for increasing radiation and wear resistance of an anti-adhesiv layer on an aluminium plate | Examination procedure | 07.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/36] | 23.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5694674 (FLAMMANG DENIS) [A] 1,2 * column 6, line 59 - column 7, line 62; figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE9111901U (KLUSENDICK) [A] 1,2; | [A]US5497696 (COUDURIER ALAIN ET AL); | [A]US5564590 (KIM MYUNG-SUK); | [A]US4350259 (CARTOSSI FERDINANDO); | [A]FR2741553 (SEB SA); | [A]FR2693093 (SEB SA) |