EP1002714 - Hull for a hydroplane watercraft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Villard, Gérard 22 Rue du Communeau F-44360 Saint Etienne de Montluc / FR | [2000/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/21] | Representative(s) | Bonnetat, Christian Gevers France 41, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | Bonnetat, Christian CABINET BONNETAT 29, rue de St. Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99402261.4 | 15.09.1999 | [2000/21] | Priority number, date | FR19980014459 | 18.11.1998 Original published format: FR 9814459 | [2000/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1002714 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B63B1/18, B63B35/79, B63B1/04, B63B35/73 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
B63B1/18 (EP);
B63B32/40 (EP,US);
B63B1/041 (EP);
B63B32/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/21] | Title | German: | Rumpf für ein Gleitboot | [2000/21] | English: | Hull for a hydroplane watercraft | [2000/21] | French: | Coque pour engin de navigation destiné à glisser sur l'eau | [2000/21] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 03.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/42] | 13.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US3276050 (PHILIP EDWARDS) [YD] 1,2,5,10 * figures 1-5 * * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 45 *; | [AD]US3289227 (KELLY JR JOHN M) [AD] 1,7,10 * figures 2,4,8,11; claims 1,3 * * column 2, line 21 - line 38 * * column 2, line 56 - line 62 * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 6 *; | [AD]US3950808 (SORENSON HUGH E) [AD] 1,5,8-10* abstract *; | [AD]DE2842675 (MARKER HANNES) [AD] 1,6,7,10 * figures 1-3; claims 1-3 * * page 4, line 14 - page 5, line 25 *; | [AD]EP0059345 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) [AD] 1,6,7,10 * figures 1,2A; claim 1 * * page 3, line 17 - page 5, line 4 *; | [AD]US4641599 (THOMAS CHARLES E [US], et al) [AD] 1,5,10 * abstract * * column 2, line 38 - line 47 *; | [A]FR2596110 (ALCANTARA GERARD [FR]) [A] 1-4,10,4,5 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9727100 (LAPLANTE BERNARD [CA], et al) [Y] 1,2,5,10 * abstract * | by applicant | US3276050 | US3289227 | US3950808 | DE2842675 | EP0059345 | US4641599 |