EP1088912 - Growth in solution of compound or alloy crystals in a floating zone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2008 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 25, rue Leblanc Immeuble "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | [2006/44] |
Former [2006/27] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération 75752 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | ||
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states Forschungsverbund Berlin e.V. Rudower Chaussee 17 12489 Berlin / DE | ||
For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération 75752 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wollweber, Jürgen Schoenefelder Chaussee 223 12524 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Duffar, Thierry 57, rue du Drac 38000 Grenoble / FR | 03 /
Santailler, Jean-Louis Le Gay, Saint-Hean de Moirans 38430 Moirans / FR | 04 /
Chevrier, Véronique 4, rue de Chambord 33600 Pessac / FR | [2001/14] | Representative(s) | Audier, Philippe André, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | Audier, Philippe André, et al Brevalex, 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/14] | Des Termes, Monique, et al Société Brevatome 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99402362.0 | 28.09.1999 | [2001/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1088912 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C30B13/02, C30B13/00, C30B29/36, C30B29/38, C30B29/52 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
C30B13/02 (EP,US);
C30B13/00 (EP,US);
C30B29/36 (EP,US);
C30B29/38 (EP,US);
C30B29/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [2002/01] |
Former [2001/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Züchtung von Verbindungs- oder Legierungskristallen in einer Lösung einer tiegelfreier Zonenschmelze | [2001/14] | English: | Growth in solution of compound or alloy crystals in a floating zone | [2001/14] | French: | Croissance en solution dans une zone flottante de cristaux d'un composé ou d'un alliage | [2001/14] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 05.10.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE | 13.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/18] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.11.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5860699 ; | [Y]DE1196625 (SIEMENS AG) [Y] 1-4,6-11,14-17 * column 6, line 20 - line 61 *; | [YD] - GILLESEN ET AL., "Growth of silicon carbide from liquid silicon by a travelling heater method.", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH., NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING CO. AMSTERDAM., NL, (1973), vol. 19, ISSN 0022-0248, pages 263 - 268, XP002130517 [YD] 1-4,6-11,14-17 * page 266; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-0248(73)90050-X | [Y] - NORLUND ET AL., "Crystal growth of incongruently melting compounds", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH., NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING CO. AMSTERDAM., NL, (1983), vol. 62, no. 2, ISSN 0022-0248, pages 320 - 328, XP002130518 [Y] 1-4,6-11,14-17 * page 323 - page 325; figure 9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-0248(83)90310-X | [A] - WOLLWEBER J ET AL, "SIXGE1-X SINGLE CRYSTALS GROWN BY THE RF-HEATED FLOAT ZONE TECHNIQUE", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH,NL,NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING CO. AMSTERDAM, (19960601), vol. 163, no. 3, ISSN 0022-0248, pages 243 - 248, XP000627507 [A] 1,13,14,16 * page 244; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-0248(95)00968-X | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830628), vol. 007, no. 147, Database accession no. (C - 173), & JP58060699 A 19830411 (KAGAKU GIJIYUTSUCHIYOU MUKIZAISHITSU KENKYUSHO) [A] 1,14 * abstract * | [A] - HONDA T ET AL, "GROWTH AND CHARACTERIZATION OF BULK SI-GE SINGLE CRYSTALS", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS,JP,PUBLICATION OFFICE JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS. TOKYO, (19961201), vol. 35, no. 12A, ISSN 0021-4922, pages 5980 - 5985, XP000658952 [A] 1,13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.35.5980 | [A] - BARZ A ET AL, "GERMANIUM-RICH SIGE BULK SINGLE CRYSTALS GROWN BY THE VERTICAL BRIDGMAN METHOD AND BY ZONE MELTING", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY: PART B,US,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, (199809), vol. 16, no. 5, ISSN 0734-211X, pages 1627 - 1630, XP000802513 [A] 1,5,13,14,18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.589950 |