EP0995810 - Stainless steel alloy for pulp refiner plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J & L Fiber Services, Inc. 809 Philip Drive Waukesha, WI 53186 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | For all designated states J&L Fiber Services, Inc. 809 Philip Drive Waukesha, Wisconsin 53186 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dodd, John F & L Fiber Services Inc., 809 Philip Drive Waukesha, WI 53186 / US | [2000/17] | Representative(s) | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie SCHMIT CHRETIEN 8, Place du Ponceau 95000 Cergy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie Cabinet Christian Schmit et Associes, 8, place du Ponceau 95000 Cergy / FR | Application number, filing date | 99402513.8 | 14.10.1999 | [2000/17] | Priority number, date | US19980175241 | 20.10.1998 Original published format: US 175241 | [2000/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0995810 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/42, C22C38/48, C22C38/20, C22C38/26 | [2000/17] | CPC: |
C22C38/005 (EP,US);
C22C38/42 (EP,US);
C22C38/44 (EP,US);
C22C38/46 (EP,US);
C22C38/48 (EP,US);
C21D6/004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2001/02] |
Former [2000/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Rostfreie Stahllegierung für Papiermasserafinierplatte | [2000/17] | English: | Stainless steel alloy for pulp refiner plate | [2000/17] | French: | Acier inoxydable pour disque de raffineur de pate à papier | [2000/17] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/50] | 12.10.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 27.10.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.10.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 23.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY | 23.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | 03.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/18] | 03.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.12.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9740204 (BELOIT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4-18 * claims 1-10 * [A] 3; | [A]WO9211941 (SUNDS DEFIBRATOR IND AB [SE]) [A] 1-18; | [A]US3614826 (PILAO MILTON) [A] 1-18; | [A]US5740972 (MATTHEW JOHN B [US]) [A] 1-18 |